VA HB2026 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial vehicles; persons required to register with the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry. Prohibits persons for whom registration with the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry is required from driving school buses and from being issued commercial driver's licenses and instruction permits to drive school buses.
Title
Commercial vehicles; person required to register with Sex Offender & Crimes Against Minors Registry.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 477 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2026ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105276D-S1 (94-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2026S1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105276D-S1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105276D-S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2026H2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Substitute by Delegate May agreed to 11105185D-H2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Floor substitute printed 11105185D-H2 (May) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute rejected 11104543D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-03 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Incorporates HB1733 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104543D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-18 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102782D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 339 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.18:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |