VA HB2017 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
Hearing: Jan 15 @ 9:30 am in House Committee Room
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Auxiliary grants; supportive housing. Allows individuals receiving auxiliary grants to select supportive housing without any requirement that such individuals wait until their first or any subsequent annual reassessment to make such a selection. The bill directs the Commissioner for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to (i) promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill within 180 days of its enactment and (ii) develop guidance documents for implementation of the provisions of the bill no later than February 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auxiliary grants; supportive housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102319D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515160(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback