VA HB2013 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2013

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School board policies; school meal debt; enforcement. Requires each school board to adopt a policy that prohibits the board from filing a lawsuit against a student or the student's parent because the student cannot pay for a meal at school or owes a school meal debt. School board policies; school meal debt; enforcement. Requires each school board to adopt a policy that prohibits the board from filing a lawsuit against a student or the student's parent because the student cannot pay for a meal at school or owes a school meal debt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards; board policy for students unable to pay for a meal at school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
2021-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 106 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2013ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
2021-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (69-Y 31-N)
2021-01-27HousePrinted as engrossed 21101524D-E
2021-01-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2013E
2021-01-27HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-27HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101524D

Same As/Similar To

HB2013 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22179.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2013
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2013+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2013E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2013ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0106+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2013AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2013F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2013FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2013FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0901C0062+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0039+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1231+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0110+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0045+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2013+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0278HB2013+HB2013

Bill Comments

feedback