VA HB2005 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Disposition of the remains of a decedent; persons to make arrangements for funeral and disposition of remains. Establishes an order of priority for persons who have the right to make arrangements and otherwise be responsible for a decedent's funeral and the disposition of his remains and establishes processes by which such persons may assert or forfeit their right to make arrangements and otherwise be responsible for a decedent's funeral and the disposition of his remains. The bill also provides protections for any funeral service establishment, funeral service establishment manager of record, funeral service licensee, funeral director, embalmer, registered crematory, registered crematory owner, registered crematory manager of record, or certified crematory operator that relies upon a written statement made by a person attesting to his right to make arrangements or otherwise be responsible for a decedent's funeral and sets out rights of funeral service establishments when there is a dispute regarding the arrangements of a decedent's funeral or his remains or the identity of any persons who have the right to make arrangements for the decedent. The bill also adds provisions related to designation of a person to make arrangements for a decedent's funeral or disposition of a decedent's remains, clarification of decision-making authority when next of kin disagrees, and procedures in the absence of next of kin for cemeteries or cemetery companies. Disposition of the remains of a decedent; persons to make arrangements for funeral and disposition of remains. Establishes an order of priority for persons who have the right to make arrangements and otherwise be responsible for a decedent's funeral and the disposition of his remains and establishes processes by which such persons may assert or forfeit their right to make arrangements and otherwise be responsible for a decedent's funeral and the disposition of his remains. The bill also provides protections for any funeral service establishment, funeral service establishment manager of record, funeral service licensee, funeral director, embalmer, registered crematory, registered crematory owner, registered crematory manager of record, or certified crematory operator that relies upon a written statement made by a person attesting to his right to make arrangements or otherwise be responsible for a decedent's funeral and sets out rights of funeral service establishments when there is a dispute regarding the arrangements of a decedent's funeral or his remains or the identity of any persons who have the right to make arrangements for the decedent. The bill also adds provisions related to designation of a person to make arrangements for a decedent's funeral or disposition of a decedent's remains, clarification of decision-making authority when next of kin disagrees, and procedures in the absence of next of kin for cemeteries or cemetery companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposition of the remains of a decedent; persons to make arrangements for funeral.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2005H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103975D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103975D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100550D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321309.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412800(n/a)See Bill Text
5412807(n/a)See Bill Text
5412807.01(n/a)See Bill Text
5412807.02(n/a)See Bill Text
5412825(n/a)See Bill Text
5412825.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2005
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2005+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2005H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103819D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103819.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103975D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2005F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2005FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1202V0008+HB2005
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0090+HB2005
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1386+HB2005
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0135+HB2005

Bill Comments 750

feedback