VA HB2001 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2001
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Building standards for certain state and local buildings. Requires that any executive branch agency or institution or locality entering the design phase for the construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size or the renovation of a building where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building ensure that such building has sufficient electric vehicle charging infrastructure, defined in the bill, and has features that permit the agency or institution to track the building's energy efficiency and carbon emissions. The bill authorizes the Director of the Department of General Services to grant exemptions to such standards, in writing and with certain terms. The bill requires agencies to annually report to the Governor the energy efficiency and carbon emissions metrics for each such building built or renovated. Building standards for certain state and local buildings. Requires that any executive branch agency or institution or locality entering the design phase for the construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size or the renovation of a building where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building ensure that such building has sufficient electric vehicle charging infrastructure, defined in the bill, and has features that permit the agency or institution to track the building's energy efficiency and carbon emissions. The bill authorizes the Director of the Department of General Services to grant exemptions to such standards, in writing and with certain terms. The bill requires agencies to annually report to the Governor the energy efficiency and carbon emissions metrics for each such building built or renovated. The bill requires localities to design such building projects according to the same or similar standards, or more stringent standards if adopted by ordinance. The bill also requires that localities incorporate appropriate resilience and distributed energy features. The bill requires that any exemption from the standards granted by resolution of the governing body of a locality be made in writing and explain the basis for granting the exemption. The bill contains a delayed enactment of July 1, 2023, with respect to the provisions related to any locality with a population of less than 100,000.
Title
State and local buildings, certain; building standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 473 (effective - see bill) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2001ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (52-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (10-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 45-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2001H2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21103607D-H2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 21103258D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Substitute bill reprinted 21103607D-H2 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103607D-H2 |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103258D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102562D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2001 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1804.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1183 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |