VA HB2001 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Immigration enforcement at public institutions of higher education. Requires the governing board and each employee of each public institution of higher education to cooperate in the enforcement of federal law by U.S. Customs and Immigration Enforcement on the institution's campus, in any noncampus building or property, and on public property, as such terms are defined in relevant state law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions; immigration enforcement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseLeft in Education
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102603D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231405.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback