VA HB2000 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Procurement of dogs and cats for research; public institutions of higher education. Permits public institutions of higher education to purchase or otherwise acquire dogs and cats for use in research, experimentation, or testing from any person or company only if the State Veterinarian or his assistant has inspected such person or company and has determined that no violations of state law regarding the care, control, or protection of or property rights in animals have occurred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; procurement of dogs and cats for research.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 2-N)
2023-01-17HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100503D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326593.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback