VA HB1992 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lien priority. Inserts "real estate" in several places related to the priority of tax liens so that the operative language now reads "on a parity with liens for unpaid local real estate taxes." This bill is identical to SB 920.
Title
Lien priority; inserts "real estate" in several places related to priority of tax liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1992ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101885D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 908.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |