VA HB1992 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Banks; capital stock. Exempts restricted stock award plans from the requirement that a bank's capital stock be paid in money. The measure also provides that a stock option shall not be granted at a price which is less than 100 percent of the fair market value per share of the stock; an existing provision limits such price to 100 percent of the stock's book value as shown by the bank's last published statement prior to the granting of the option.
Title
Banks; capital stock.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 240 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1992ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101090D |