VA HB1990 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1990
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Racial and ethnic impact statements for criminal justice legislation. Provides that the Chair of the House Committee for Courts of Justice or the Chair of the Senate Committee on the Judiciary may request the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to review and prepare a racial and ethnic impact statement for a proposed criminal justice bill to outline its potential impact on racial and ethnic disparities within the Commonwealth. The bill requires JLARC to provide copies of the impact statement to the requesting chair and the patron of the proposed bill. No more than three racial and ethnic impact statements may be requested by each chair for completion during a single regular session of the General Assembly. Racial and ethnic impact statements for criminal justice legislation. Provides that the Chair of the House Committee for Courts of Justice or the Chair of the Senate Committee on the Judiciary may request the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to review and prepare a racial and ethnic impact statement for a proposed criminal justice bill to outline its potential impact on racial and ethnic disparities within the Commonwealth. The bill requires JLARC to provide copies of the impact statement to the requesting chair and the patron of the proposed bill. No more than three racial and ethnic impact statements may be requested by each chair for completion during a single regular session of the General Assembly.
Title
Criminal justice legislation; racial and ethnic impact statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Morrissey rejected (14-Y 24-N) (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Morrissey rejected (14-Y 24-N) (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 183 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1990ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 36-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (62-Y 36-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Morrissey rejected (14-Y 24-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (69-Y 31-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101711D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1990 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)