VA HB1983 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Wetland and stream mitigation banks; proximity of impacted site. Provides that when a water protection permit applicant is required to purchase wetland or stream mitigation bank credits but no credits are available (i) in any mitigation provider's primary service area or (ii) at a cost of less than 200 percent of the price of credits available from a fund dedicated to achieving no net loss of wetland acreage and functions, the applicant may purchase or use credits from a mitigation provider's secondary service area. The bill provides certain requirements that the permit applicant must comply with in order to purchase or use such credits from a secondary service area, including minimum tree canopy requirements. Wetland and stream mitigation banks; proximity of impacted site. Provides that when a water protection permit applicant is required to purchase wetland or stream mitigation bank credits but no credits are available (i) in any mitigation provider's primary service area or (ii) at a cost of less than 200 percent of the price of credits available from a fund dedicated to achieving no net loss of wetland acreage and functions, the applicant may purchase or use credits from a mitigation provider's secondary service area. The bill provides certain requirements that the permit applicant must comply with in order to purchase or use such credits from a secondary service area, including minimum tree canopy requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wetland and stream mitigation banks; proximity of impacted site.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N 1-A)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (84-Y 15-N 1-A)
2021-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 21102632D-E
2021-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1983E
2021-01-22HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-22HouseRead second time
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N)
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102632D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.15:23(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:23.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback