VA HB1979 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Assisted conception. Amends the assisted conception statute to provide gender-neutral terminology. The bill allows an unmarried individual to be an intended parent, paralleling the ability of an unmarried individual to adopt under the adoption statutes. The bill further allows for the use of an embryo subject to the legal or contractual custody of an intended parent in a surrogacy arrangement. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted conception; amends statute to provide gender-neutral terminology, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1979ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 36-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106595D-S1 (63-Y 36-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (28-Y 12-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1979S1
2019-02-18SenateAmendment by Senator Peake rejected
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106595D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106595D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 36-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 7-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101108D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1979
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1979+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1979S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1979ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0375+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0064+HB1979
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0124+HB1979
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2463+HB1979
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0291+HB1979
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1979+HB1979
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0759HB1979+HB1979
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3160+HB1979

Bill Comments

feedback