VA HB1969 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Retirement System; cash balance retirement plan. Directs the Virginia Retirement System to develop a proposed cash balance retirement plan and provide the proposal to the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Retirement System; cash balance retirement plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
2015-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1969ER)
2015-02-24HouseEnrolled
2015-02-19SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19SenateRead third time
2015-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-17SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2015-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2015-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-10HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1969H1
2015-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15104858D-H1
2015-02-09HouseRead second time
2015-02-07HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 15104858D-H1
2015-02-06HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2015-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
2015-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
2015-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103182D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1969
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1969+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1969H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1969ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0511+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H0202V0009+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H02V0047+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2080+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S05V0265+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0559HB1969+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0615HB1969+HB1969

Bill Comments 750

feedback