VA HB1965 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; required Virginia Freedom of Information Act; required release of law-enforcement disciplinary records; exceptions. Requires the release of law-enforcement disciplinary records related to completed disciplinary investigations. The bill defines "law-enforcement disciplinary records" as any record created in furtherance of a law-enforcement disciplinary proceeding or any other administrative or judicial proceeding arising from the law-enforcement officer's conduct, whether such proceeding takes place in the Commonwealth or in another jurisdiction. The bill requires the redaction of (i) certain personal contact information of the law-enforcement officer, complainant, and witness and of their families; (ii) social security numbers; (iii) certain medical and identifying information of the law-enforcement officer and complainant; and (iv) any technical infraction, as defined in the bill, by the law-enforcement officer.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; required release of law-enforcement disciplinary records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in General Laws |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101217D |