VA HB1961 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Portsmouth. Changes the deadline for the filing of a petition nominating a candidate for the office of mayor or city council member from the first Tuesday in June to the second Tuesday of June of the year of election. The amendment also moves the deadline for appointing a campaign treasurer from the first to the second Tuesday of June and makes the technical change of allowing the circulation of petitions to begin on January 1, as permitted by the Code of Virginia, rather than on the first Tuesday in January.
Title
Charter; City of Portsmouth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 432 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1961ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 13102336D-E |
2013-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1961E |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Emergency clause deleted |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13102336D |