VA HB1960 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; low alcohol beverage coolers. Allows low alcohol beverage coolers to be manufactured by a licensed distiller or a distiller located outside of the Commonwealth. The bill also allows licensed distillers to use spirits manufactured by another licensed distiller in the manufacture of low alcohol beverage coolers. In addition, the bill allows (i) low alcohol beverage coolers to be sold in government stores and (ii) distillers to sell low alcohol beverage coolers that are manufactured or blended by such distillers at government stores established on their licensed premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; manufacture/sale of low alcohol beverage cooler.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1960ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1960H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104696D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104696D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102648D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41100(n/a)See Bill Text
41111(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1960
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1960+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1960H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1960ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0466+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0011+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0071+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1965+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2011+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0070+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0344+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1960+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0714HB1960+HB1960

Bill Comments

feedback