VA HB196 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Left in Rehabilitation and Social Services
Pending: Senate Rehabilitation and Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Extensions of hearings to review findings by local departments of social services related to child abuse or neglect. Provides that a person who appeals a determination by a local department of social services related to child abuse or neglect to a hearing officer designated by the Commissioner of Social Services may request extensions of the hearing but that no extension causing the hearing to be delayed more than 90 days after the date on which the hearing was first scheduled to be held shall be granted absent a showing of compelling reasons to justify such extension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse or neglect; extension of hearings to review findings by local depts. of social services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateLeft in Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 18101323D-E
2018-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB196E
2018-02-05HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-05HouseRead second time
2018-02-02HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2018-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-18HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-28HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-12-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101323D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321526(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback