VA HB1951 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid, performance, and payment bonds. Raises the minimum contract amount required for bid, performance, or payment bonds from $100,000 to $500,000 for nontransportation-related construction projects. The bill provides that for nontransportation-related construction projects between $100,000 and $500,000 where the bond requirements are waived, the prospective contractors must be prequalified. The amount ($250,000) for transportation-related projects partially or wholly funded by the Commonwealth, however, remains the same.
Title
Public Procurement Act; raises minimum contract amount required for bid, performance, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Matthew James [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 789 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1951ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1951ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1951H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105026D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105026D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102215D |