VA HB1950 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1950
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health and the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; plan for the establishment of a Fetal and Infant Mortality Review Team; report. Directs the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner of the Department of Health to convene a work group to develop a plan for the establishment of a Fetal and Infant Mortality Review Team and to report such plan to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committees on Finance and Appropriations and Education and Health by December 1, 2021. Department of Health and the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; plan for the establishment of a Fetal and Infant Mortality Review Team; report. Directs the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner of the Department of Health to convene a work group to develop a plan for the establishment of a Fetal and Infant Mortality Review Team and to report such plan to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committees on Finance and Appropriations and Education and Health by December 1, 2021.
Title
Fetal and Infant Mortality Review Team; Va. Department of Health, et al., to establish, report.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 164 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1950ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103383D-EH1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1950EH1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103383D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103383D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102746D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1950 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)