VA HB1937 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; exemptions for elderly and handicapped; computation of income limitation. Provides that, if a locality has established a real estate tax exemption for the elderly and handicapped and enacted an income limitation related to the exemption, the locality may exclude, for purposes of the limitation, any disability income received by a family member or nonrelative who lives in the dwelling and who is permanently and totally disabled.
Title
Real property tax; exemptions for elderly and handicapped, computation of income limitation.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 16 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1937ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Printed as engrossed 19100954D-E |
2019-01-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1937E |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-17 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100954D |