VA HB1930 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1930
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; admissions applications; criminal history. Prohibits each public institution of higher education, with the exception of the Virginia Military Institute and a law school of a public institution of higher education that is accredited by the American Bar Association, from (i) utilizing an institution-specific admissions application that contains questions about the criminal history of the applicant or (ii) denying admission to any applicant on the basis of any criminal history information provided by the applicant on any third-party admissions application accepted by the institution. The bill permits each public institution of higher education to inquire into the criminal history of any individual who has been admitted to but has yet to enroll at the institution and withdraw an offer of admission to any individual whom the institution subsequently determines to have a criminal history that poses a threat to the institution's community. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Public institutions of higher education; admissions applications; criminal history. Prohibits each public institution of higher education, with the exception of the Virginia Military Institute and a law school of a public institution of higher education that is accredited by the American Bar Association, from (i) utilizing an institution-specific admissions application that contains questions about the criminal history of the applicant or (ii) denying admission to any applicant on the basis of any criminal history information provided by the applicant on any third-party admissions application accepted by the institution. The bill permits each public institution of higher education to inquire into the criminal history of any individual who has been admitted to but has yet to enroll at the institution and withdraw an offer of admission to any individual whom the institution subsequently determines to have a criminal history that poses a threat to the institution's community. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; admissions applications criminal history questions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 440 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1930ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (55-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 42-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100825D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1930 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Criminal History Information
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions