VA HB1930 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Safe reporting of overdoses. Extends to an individual experiencing a drug-related or alcohol-related overdose the affirmative defense to prosecution for (i) simple possession of a controlled substance, marijuana, or controlled paraphernalia; (ii) intoxication in public; or (iii) the unlawful purchase, possession, or consumption of alcohol, if another individual, in good faith, sought or obtained emergency medical attention for the individual experiencing the overdose. Under current law, the affirmative defense applies only to an individual who sought or obtained emergency medical attention for another individual experiencing an overdose or to an individual
Title
Overdoses; safe reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100409D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1930 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1930+hil |