VA HB1927 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Filing of tax returns or payment of taxes by mail. Provides that a remittance of a tax return or a tax payment shall be deemed to have been timely received if, through no fault of the taxpayer, no postmark is affixed or the postmark affixed by the United States Postal Service is illegible or bears no date and such tax return or payment is received within five days of the due date. The bill also provides that no penalty or interest shall be imposed (i) if a taxpayer provides evidence that a tax return filing or a tax payment was timely by producing a United States Postal Service Certificate of Mailing, or other proof of mailing, showing such return was filed or such payment was made on time or (ii) if a taxpayer's failure to file a return or to pay a tax to a locality was the fault of the United States Postal Service. Filing of tax returns or payment of taxes by mail. Provides that a remittance of a tax return or a tax payment shall be deemed to have been timely received if, through no fault of the taxpayer, no postmark is affixed or the postmark affixed by the United States Postal Service is illegible or bears no date and such tax return or payment is received within five days of the due date. The bill also provides that no penalty or interest shall be imposed (i) if a taxpayer provides evidence that a tax return filing or a tax payment was timely by producing a United States Postal Service Certificate of Mailing, or other proof of mailing, showing such return was filed or such payment was made on time or (ii) if a taxpayer's failure to file a return or to pay a tax to a locality was the fault of the United States Postal Service.
Title
Tax returns; filing returns or payment of taxes by mail.
Sponsors
Del. Tara Durant [R] | Del. Ellen Campbell [R] | Del. Phillip Scott [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Del. Wren Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 163 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100898D |