VA HB1923 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1923
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; broadband capacity pilot program. Expands an existing pilot program under which Dominion Energy and Appalachian Power are authorized to provide or make available broadband capacity to Internet service providers in areas of the Commonwealth that are unserved by broadband to include municipal Internet service providers. The current program is restricted to nongovernmental Internet service providers.
Title
Electric utilities; expands existing broadband capacity pilot program.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Candi Mundon King [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101272D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1923 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)