VA HB192 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fair Housing Board educational materials on the Fair Housing Law; affidavit. Establishes that the Fair Housing Board shall promulgate regulations regarding educational materials concerning the Fair Housing Law, and persons in the business of selling or renting dwelling units without a real estate broker shall submit an affidavit to the Board that they have read and understood the law. This is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Fair Housing Board; establishes educational materials on Fair Housing Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (86-Y 7-N) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (5-Y 94-N) (Y: 5 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 91 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (86-Y 7-N) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (5-Y 94-N) (Y: 5 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 91 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 620 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB192ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (86-Y 7-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 7-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Delegates: Cosgrove, Comstock, Torian | |
2010-03-02 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Senators: Locke, Miller, J.C., Herring | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-01 | House: House acceded to request | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (5-Y 94-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (5-Y 94-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB192S1 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105454D-S1 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105454D-S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB192H1 | |
2010-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105052D-H1 | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105052D-H1 | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2010-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103166D |