VA HB1919 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; prohibited gifts and contributions. Requires any person or entity submitting an application for a grant or loan from the Governor's Development Opportunity Fund to certify that it shall not provide a contribution, gift, or other item with a value greater than $100 to the Governor or to his campaign committee or a political action committee established on his behalf during (i) the period in which the person or entity's application for such award is pending and (ii) the one-year period immediately after any such award is made. Any award received by a person or entity who so certifies and subsequently makes such a contribution or gift during these periods must be repaid by the recipient of the award within 90 days of receipt of written notice of the violation from the Virginia Economic Development Partnership. The bill also provides that any person or entity that knowingly provided or provides such a contribution or gift during these periods is subject to a civil penalty of $500 or up to two times the amount of the contribution or gift, whichever is greater.
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; prohibited gifts and contributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2070-Gilbert) by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103507D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2070 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1919 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1919+hil |