VA HB1916 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1916
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Research and development tax credits. Provides that the research and development expenses tax credit and the major research and development expenses tax credit shall be available against the bank franchise tax for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2021. Under current law, the credits are available only against the individual and corporate income tax.
Title
Research and development expenses; tax credit available against the bank franchise tax.
Sponsors
Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Don Scott [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 47 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1916ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101909D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1916 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
SB1112 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
SB1112 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
SB1112 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
SB1112 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |