VA HB1912 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1912
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Child support payments; juvenile in custody of or committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice. Provides that the Department of Juvenile Justice is no longer required to apply for child support from, and the parent of a juvenile is no longer responsible to pay child support to, the Department of Social Services for a juvenile who is in the temporary custody of or committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice. Child support payments; juvenile in custody of or committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice. Provides that the Department of Juvenile Justice is no longer required to apply for child support from, and the parent of a juvenile is no longer responsible to pay child support to, the Department of Social Services for a juvenile who is in the temporary custody of or committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice.
Title
Child support payments; juvenile in custody of or committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 21100945D-E |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1912E |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100945D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1912 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 286 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |