VA HB1912 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility ratemaking procedures; recognition of Commonwealth Energy Policy. Directs the State Corporation Commission (SCC), when required to approve the construction of an electric utility facility, to consider the economic and job creation objectives of the Commonwealth Energy Policy. The SCC is also directed, when determining the reasonableness or prudence of a utility's use of renewable energy resources, to consider the extent to which the use of such resources furthers the objectives of the Commonwealth Energy Policy and whether the cost of such resources is likely to result in unreasonable increases in rates paid by consumers.
Title
Commonwealth Energy Policy; SCC to consider effect of proposed facility on economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 236 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1912ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1912H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104630D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104630D-H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102667D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Energy Conservation and Resources
Public Service Companies
State Corporation Commission
Energy Conservation and Resources
Public Service Companies
State Corporation Commission