VA HB1911 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; certain gifts prohibited; foreign countries of concern. Prohibits officers and employees of state and local governments, including legislators or members of their immediate family who may accept such a gift on behalf of the Commonwealth, from receiving a gift with a value exceeding $100 for which the fair market value or a gift of greater or equal value has not been provided or exchanged from foreign countries of concern, defined in the bill.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; certain gifts prohibited, foreign countries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (89-Y 3-N) (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 291 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1911ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (89-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23107308D-S1 (89-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1911S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Cosgrove agreed to 23107308D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 23107308D-S1 (Cosgrove) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1911H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105959D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105959D-H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101894D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1002 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
SB1002 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
SB1002 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Conflict of Interests
Foreign Governments and Countries
General Assembly
Local Government and Officials
Conflict of Interests
Foreign Governments and Countries
General Assembly
Local Government and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 106.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |