VA HB1911 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senators: Carrico, Obenshain, Petersen
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Duties of drivers of vehicles approaching stationary vehicles displaying certain warning lights; penalty. Makes a driver's failure to move into a nonadjacent lane on a highway with at least four lanes when approaching a stationary vehicle displaying flashing, blinking, or alternating blue, red, or amber lights, or, if changing lanes would be unreasonable or unsafe, to proceed with due caution and maintain a safe speed, reckless driving, which is punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, a first such offense is a traffic infraction punishable by a fine of not more than $250, and a second such offense is punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Duties of drivers approaching stationary vehicles displaying certain warning lights; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Carrico, Obenshain, Petersen
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Peace, Adams, L.R., Hope
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute with amendment rejected by House 19106735D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1911S1
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106735D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106735D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1911H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106242D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106242D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101248D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462921.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1911
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1911+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1911H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1911S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0112+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0112+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2355+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0241+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0386+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB1911+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0895HB1911+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3204+HB1911
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0979HB1911+HB1911

Bill Comments

feedback