VA HB1909 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1909

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certain school board property; establishment of gun-free zone permitted. Permits any school board to deem any non-school zone building or property that it owns or leases where employees of such school board are regularly present for the purpose of performing their official duties as a gun-free zone and prohibit any individual from knowingly possessing, purchasing, transferring, carrying, storing, or transporting firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof while such individual is upon such property, except certain individuals such as law-enforcement officers and qualified retired law-enforcement officers. Certain school board property; establishment of gun-free zone permitted. Permits any school board to deem any non-school zone building or property that it owns or leases where employees of such school board are regularly present for the purpose of performing their official duties as a gun-free zone and prohibit any individual from knowingly possessing, purchasing, transferring, carrying, storing, or transporting firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof while such individual is upon such property, except certain individuals such as law-enforcement officers and qualified retired law-enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School board building or property, certain; establishment of gun-free zone permitted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 439 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1909ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27HouseVOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2021-02-27 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-25SenateSenators: Hashmi, Lewis, McClellan
2021-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-25HouseDelegates: Subramanyam, Hope, Coyner
2021-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-25HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-24SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-24SenateSenate insisted on amendments (35-Y 4-N)
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
2021-02-23HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
2021-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate with amendments (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-22SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-22SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateRead second time
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
2021-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1909H1
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103262D-H1
2021-01-26HouseRead second time
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103262D-H1
2021-01-22HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2021-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100496D

Same As/Similar To

HB1909 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221131.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1909
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1909+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1909H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1909ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0439+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1909AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1909ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1909AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1909F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1909FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1909FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1501C0003+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H15C0006+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1195+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0096+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0076+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0273HB1909+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1875+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0399HB1909+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0516HB1909+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV2006+HB1909

Bill Comments 750

feedback