VA HB19 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax deduction for certain purchases from space flight entities. Provides an individual income tax deduction in the amount paid for a prepaid contract entered into with a commercial space flight entity to place the taxpayer's cremated remains in earth or lunar orbit. The deduction shall not exceed $8,000 in total and shall not exceed $2,500 in any one tax year. The bill is effective for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2013, but before January 1, 2021.
Title
Income tax, state; deduction for certain purchases from space flight entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Finance | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 | |
2011-12-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-12-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100278D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB19 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB19+hil |