VA HB1898 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant's right of redemption. Extends the amount of time that a tenant may have an unlawful detainer dismissed to two days before a writ of eviction is delivered to be executed if the tenant pays all amounts claimed on the summons in unlawful detainer to the landlord, the landlord's attorney, or the court.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord & Tenant Act; tenant's right of redemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 28 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 15, 2019 | |
2019-02-08 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 8, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1898ER) |
2019-02-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1898H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104868D-H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104868D-H1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103851D |