VA HB1895 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charter; Town of Irvington. Updates the town's boundary description. Other changes replace outdated provisions regarding the timing of town council elections and the mayor's duties. This bill is identical to SB 1350.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Irvington, Town of; amending charter, updates the town's boundary description, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 694 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1895ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-15SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-15SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-24HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-24HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1895H1
2019-01-23HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104909D-H1
2019-01-23HouseRead second time
2019-01-22HouseRead first time
2019-01-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104909D-H1
2019-01-18HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102671D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1895
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1895+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1895H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1895ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0694+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0701V0003+HB1895
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0008+HB1895
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1811+HB1895
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1825+HB1895
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0081+HB1895
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1895+HB1895
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1895+HB1895
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3049+HB1895

Bill Comments

feedback