VA HB1895 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Additional financial and administrative authority for certain public institutions of higher education. Permits the board of visitors or other governing body of any public institution of higher education that has entered into and successfully renewed a memorandum of understanding with the appropriate Cabinet Secretary or Secretaries to exercise, with some variation, (i) additional authority in the functional areas of information technology, procurement, and capital projects and (ii) the financial operational authority of covered institutions that have entered into management agreements. Under current law, such boards of visitors and governing bodies are limited to exercising authority in two of the three functional areas of information technology, procurement, and capital projects. The bill also describes the conditions for renewal and revocation of such authority and requires the accounts of each institution granted such authority to be audited by the Auditor of Public Accounts.
Title
Higher educational institutions; additional financial and administrative authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2015-02-27 | House | No further action taken |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Martin, Dance, Norment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Cox, Jones, Joannou |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105239D-S1 (1-Y 97-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1895S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105239D-S1 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105239D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-19 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101164D |