VA HB1891 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for food stamps; drug-related felonies. Provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive food stamp benefits shall not be denied such assistance solely because he has been convicted of a drug-related felony. Under current law, such individuals may not be denied food stamp benefits based on a felony conviction of possession of a controlled substance, provided that such person is complying with, or has already complied with, all obligations imposed by the criminal court, is actively engaged in or has completed a substance abuse treatment program, participates in periodic drug screenings, and fulfills any other obligations as determined by the Department of Social Services.
Title
Food stamps; eligibility, drug-related felonies.
Sponsors
Del. Matthew James [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (15-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101723D |