VA HB189 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child-placing agency; conscience clause. Provides that, to the extent allowed by federal law, no private child-placing agency shall be required to perform, assist, counsel, recommend, consent to, refer, or participate in any placement of a child for foster care or adoption when the proposed placement would violate the agency's written religious or moral convictions or policies. In addition, the bill provides that (i) the Commissioner of Social Services shall not deny an application for an initial license or renewal of a license, nor revoke a license, of any private child-placing agency and (ii) no state or local government entity shall deny a private child-placing agency any grant, contract, or participation in a government program because of the agency's objection to performing, assisting, counseling, recommending, consenting to, referring, or participating in a placement that violates the agency's written religious or moral convictions or policies. The bill provides that the refusal of a private child-placing agency to perform, assist, counsel, recommend, consent to, refer, or participate in a placement that violates its written moral or religious convictions or policies shall not form the basis of any claim for damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child-placing agency; shall not be required to participate in placement of child for foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 28-N) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
2012-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/12)
2012-02-27 Senate: Signed by President
2012-02-24 House: Signed by Speaker
2012-02-24 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB189ER)
2012-02-24 House: Enrolled
2012-02-21 Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2012-02-21 Senate: Read third time
2012-02-20 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2012-02-17 Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N)
2012-02-06 Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2012-02-06 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2012-02-03 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 28-N)
2012-02-03 House: Read third time and passed House (71-Y 28-N)
2012-02-02 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB189H1
2012-02-02 House: Amendments by Delegate Englin rejected
2012-02-02 House: Amendment by Delegate Englin rejected
2012-02-02 House: Amendments by Delegate Englin rejected
2012-02-02 House: Amendments by Delegate Englin rejected
2012-02-02 House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104360D-H1
2012-02-02 House: Read second time
2012-02-01 House: Read first time
2012-01-31 House: Committee substitute printed 12104360D-H1
2012-01-31 House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
2012-01-26 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N)
2012-01-16 House: Assigned HWI sub: #3
2012-01-09 House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2012-01-09 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101768D

Same As/Similar To

SB349 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321709.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB189
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB189+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB189H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB189ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+CHAP0690+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+H1203V0006+HB0189
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+H12V0056+HB0189
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+HV0424+HB0189
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+S09V0045+HB0189
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV0520HB0189+HB0189
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV0530HB0189+HB0189

Bill Comments

feedback