VA HB1889 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tracking dogs. Allows the use of tracking dogs on a lead to find wounded or dead bear or deer during archery, muzzleloader, or firearm bear or deer hunting seasons, so long as those who are conducting the retrieval effort have permission to hunt on or have access to the land and don't have a weapon in their possession.
Title
Tracking dogs; may be used to find wounded or dead bear or deer.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 459 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1889ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1889H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105092D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105092D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #2 Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100955D |