VA HB1887 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Incorporated by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Incorporated by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; tuition assistance for non-Virginia students; proceeds from state debt and revenues generated from state taxes and fees. Prohibits each public institution of higher education from using any proceeds from state debt or revenues generated from state taxes and fees that are appropriated to such institution to offer any form of tuition assistance to any non-Virginia student and requires each public institution of higher education to separately account for such proceeds and revenues and provide a report of expenditures from such account to the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance upon the request of such committees.
Title
Higher educational institutions; tuition assistance for non-Virginia students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Incorporated by Appropriations |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101731D |
Subjects
Education
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Tuition
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Tuition
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1887 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1887+hil |