VA HB1885 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limits on prescription of controlled substances containing opioids. Requires a prescriber registered with the Prescription Monitoring Program (the Program) to request information about a patient from the Program upon initiating a new course of treatment that includes the prescribing of opioids anticipated, at the onset of treatment, to last more than seven consecutive days and exempts the prescriber from this requirement if the opioid is prescribed as part of treatment for a surgical or invasive procedure and such prescription is for no more than 14 consecutive days. Current law requires a registered prescriber to request information about a patient from the Program upon initiating a new course of treatment that includes the prescribing of opioids anticipated, at the onset of treatment, to last more than 14 consecutive days and exempts the prescriber from this requirement if the opioid is prescribed as part of a course of treatment for a surgical or invasive procedure and such prescription is not refillable. The bill extends the sunset for this requirement from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2022.
Title
Opioids; limit on amount prescribed, extends sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249) | |
2017-02-24 | House | Enacted, Chapter 249 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1885ER2) |
2017-02-24 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1885ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1885H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104611D-H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104611D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100971D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2522.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |