VA HB188 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sentence reduction; substantial assistance to prosecution. Allows a convicted person's sentence to be reduced if such person provides substantial assistance, defined in the bill, in the furtherance of the investigation or prosecution of another person engaged in an act of violence or for offenses involving the manufacture or distribution of controlled substances or marijuana. Sentence reduction can occur only upon motion of the attorney for the Commonwealth. This bill incorporates HB 203 and is identical to SB 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentence reduction; substantial assistance to prosecution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB188ER)
2018-03-10HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseConference substitute printed 18108027D-H2
2018-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-05SenateSenators: Stanley, Obenshain, Deeds
2018-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-02HouseDelegates: Collins, Leftwich, Mullin
2018-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-02HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-01SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-01SenateSenate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2018-02-27HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107095D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2018-02-20HousePassed by until Tuesday, February 27, 2018
2018-02-19HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-16HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-16HouseReconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
2018-02-16HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107095D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB188S1
2018-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107095D-S1
2018-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-14SenateRead third time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107095D-S1
2018-02-12SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB188H1
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105628D-H1
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseIncorporates HB203 (Mullin)
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105628D-H1
2018-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-26HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102599D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192303.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB188
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB188+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB188H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB188S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB188H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB188ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0492+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0024+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0035+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0231+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0300+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0479HB0188+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0793+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0510HB0188+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1070+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0796HB0188+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1479+HB0188
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1056HB0188+HB0188

Bill Comments

feedback