VA HB1874 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1874
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health services in local correctional facilities. Requires the Board of Local and Regional Jails (the Board) to include in its minimum standards for behavioral health services in local correction facilities requirements for (i) referral of individuals committed to local correctional facilities for whom a behavioral health screening indicates reason to believe the person may have mental illness to a behavioral health service provider for a behavioral health assessment and (ii) in cases in which there is reason to believe an individual is experiencing acute mental health distress or is at risk for suicide, (a) staff of the local correctional facility to consult with the behavioral health service provider to implement immediate interventions and to provide ongoing monitoring to ensure the safety of the individual and (b) the behavioral health assessment to be completed within 72 hours of completion of the behavioral health screening unless the 72-hour period ends on a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday, in which case the assessment shall be completed by the close of business on the next working day. The bill requires the Board to (1) review the behavioral health screening and assessment process for individuals committed to local correctional facilities, (2) identify barriers to ensuring that all behavioral health assessments are completed within 72 hours of the behavioral health screening, (3) develop recommendations for addressing such barriers, and (4) report its findings and recommendations to the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security and the Chairmen of the House Committees on Health, Welfare and Institutions and Public Safety and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by October 1, 2021. Behavioral health services in local correctional facilities. Requires the Board of Local and Regional Jails (the Board) to include in its minimum standards for behavioral health services in local correction facilities requirements for (i) referral of individuals committed to local correctional facilities for whom a behavioral health screening indicates reason to believe the person may have mental illness to a behavioral health service provider for a behavioral health assessment and (ii) in cases in which there is reason to believe an individual is experiencing acute mental health distress or is at risk for suicide, (a) staff of the local correctional facility to consult with the behavioral health service provider to implement immediate interventions and to provide ongoing monitoring to ensure the safety of the individual and (b) the behavioral health assessment to be completed within 72 hours of completion of the behavioral health screening unless the 72-hour period ends on a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday, in which case the assessment shall be completed by the close of business on the next working day. The bill requires the Board to (1) review the behavioral health screening and assessment process for individuals committed to local correctional facilities, (2) identify barriers to ensuring that all behavioral health assessments are completed within 72 hours of the behavioral health screening, (3) develop recommendations for addressing such barriers, and (4) report its findings and recommendations to the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security and the Chairmen of the House Committees on Health, Welfare and Institutions and Public Safety and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by October 1, 2021.
Title
Behavioral health; assessments in local correctional facilities, report.
Sponsors
Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. John Avoli [R] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 179 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1874ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1874H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21102895D-H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 21102895D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101199D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1874 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Correctional Enterprises
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Correctional Enterprises
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports