VA HB1874 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1874
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health assessments in local correctional facilities. Provides that the State Board of Local and Regional Jails, in establishing the minimum standards for behavioral health services in local correctional facilities, shall include a requirement that if a behavioral health screening indicates that the person may have a mental illness, an assessment of his need for mental health services shall be conducted within 72 hours of the time of the screening.
Title
Behavioral health; assessments in local correctional facilities, report.
Sponsors
Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. John Avoli [R] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1874H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21102895D-H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 21102895D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101199D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1874 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)