VA HB1872 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public infrastructure maintenance bonds. Allows localities to require public infrastructure maintenance bonds from developers and property owners in conjunction with the construction of single- and two-family homes in instances where the provisions of a subdivision ordinance are not applicable. Such maintenance bonds shall not exceed an amount reasonably necessary to maintain and repair publicly owned streets, sidewalks and infrastructure on site or immediately adjacent to the construction and shall not exceed a maximum of $5,000. The ordinance shall make provision for the inspection of bonded improvements within five business days of completion and release of any performance guarantee within five business days of such inspection.
Title
Public infrastructure maintenance bonds; City of Charlottesville may require from developers, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 692 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1872ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1872H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104620D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104620D-H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102915D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1231 (Same As) 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711)