VA HB1871 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Initiative for Employment Not Welfare (VIEW); transitional child care. Allows VIEW participants whose Temporary Assistance for Needy Families financial assistance is terminated to receive child care assistance for up to 12 months after termination if the individual is enrolled in an accredited public institution of higher education or other postsecondary school licensed or certified by the Board of Education or the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia and is taking courses as part of a curriculum that leads to a postsecondary credential, such as a degree or an industry-recognized credential, certification, or license. Under current law, such child care assistance is only available if it enables the individual to work. This bill is identical to SB 1145.
Title
Virginia Initiative for Employment Not Welfare (VIEW); transitional child care.
Sponsors
Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 166 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1871ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101902D |