VA HB1870 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Discharge of deleterious substance into state waters; notice. Requires any person who unlawfully discharges any deleterious substance into state waters to give written notice to the State Water Control Board. Current law requires written notice to be given only to the Department of Environmental Quality. The bill also requires the Board or the Department to give the reported discharge information to local newspapers, television stations, and radio stations as soon as practicable after receiving it.
Title
Deleterious substances; discharge into state waters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101576D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.19:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |