VA HB1870 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Ground water withdrawal permits; subdivisions. Requires the developer of any subdivision in a ground water management area to obtain a withdrawal permit if the total volume projected to be withdrawn by all of the individual wells in the subdivision equals or exceeds 300,000 gallons per month. The bill requires a withdrawal permit for any subdivision that receives plat approval on or after January 1, 2016, and requires that the permit be amended for the construction of any additional well. The bill also specifies the procedure by which a developer may transfer the subdivision's withdrawal permit.
Title
Ground water management area; withdrawal permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101360D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1870 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1870+hil |