VA HB1866 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; expulsion of students. Removes certain weapons from the definition of "firearm" the possession of which by a student on school property or at a school-sponsored activity is punishable by mandatory expulsion from school for at least one year. These are weapons that are not included in the definition of "firearm" in the federal Improving America's Schools Act of 1994 (Part F-Gun-Free Schools Act of 1994).
Title
Public schools; mandatory expulsion of students.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1866ER) |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Students and Early Education |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102597D |