VA HB1857 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance credits for retired school division employees. Requires school divisions to provide a health insurance credit of $4 per year of service to all retired members of local school divisions with at least 15 years of total creditable service. Currently, the $4 per year of service health insurance credit is provided only to teachers, and non-teacher school division employees are eligible for a credit of $1.50 per year of service, capped at $45 per month, if the locality has elected such coverage. An enactment clause provides that this measure does not apply to any local school division employee who retired on disability prior to July 1, 2019, if this measure would reduce the monthly credit currently payable to such former member. Eligible employees who retired prior to July 1, 2019, but who did not receive a health insurance credit prior to that date will only receive the $4 per year of service health insurance credit prospectively.
Title
Health insurance; credits for retired school division employees.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101208D |